Tanguay, Agnes Marie Jeanne (CPSO#: 59162)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Apr 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Apr 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Caremedics Elmvale Acres
Unit 18
1910 St Laurent Boulevard
Ottawa ON  K1G 1A4
Phone: (613) 523-5550
Fax: (613) 523-5580
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 1988
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Nov 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Apr 2011 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Agnes  Marie  Jeanne  Tanguay   may  practise  medicine  independently  in
            General/Family medicine, only.