Taniguchi, Alan (CPSO#: 59999)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 19 Nov 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
David Braley Health Sciences Centre
100 Main Street West - 2nd Floor
Hamilton ON  L8P 1H6
Phone: (905) 525-9140 Ext. 20494
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation,St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 1991
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2007
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 May 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Quality Assurance Committee Effective: 10 May 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee Effective: 24 May 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee Effective: 07 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee Effective: 27 Feb 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 2018
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 19 Nov 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 19 Nov 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 23 Nov 2018

Pending Hearings

Summary: Allegations of Dr. Taniguchi’s professional misconduct and incompetence have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Taniguchi engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by failing to comply with terms of the Quality Assurance Committee’s (QAC) decision of July 15, 2016 requiring he complete a specified continuing education or remediation program. On May 10, 2017, the QAC issued an Order directing the Registrar to impose terms upon Dr. Taniguichi’s certificate of registration including obtaining a clinical supervisor and engaging in monthly clinical supervision meetings to review his long term patient care. It is further alleged that in 2017 and 2018, Dr. Taniguchi engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by failing to comply with terms of the QAC’s Order. On May 18, 2017, the QAC disclosed to the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee, that Dr. Taniguchi may have committed an act of professional misconduct, including but not limited to, lack of governability or may be incompetent or incapacitated. An investigation followed including into Dr. Taniguchi’s long term care practice. During the investigation, it is alleged that Dr. Taniguchi engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by failing to respond to inquiries from the College. It is also alleged that Dr. Taniguchi, in his long term care practice, is incompetent and/or failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care of patients.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 23 Nov 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from 12:01 a.m., November 19, 2018, by order of the Inquiries, Complaints
            and Reports Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the
            following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of
            registration held by Dr. Alan Taniguchi:

            Clinical Supervision

            (i)   Dr. Taniguchi shall practise under the guidance of a clinical
                  supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical Supervisor(s)"),
                  at his own expense.

            (ii)  Effective November 19, 2018, Dr. Taniguchi shall cease to practise
                  medicine until the undertaking of the Clinical Supervisor(s) attached at
                  Appendix "B" to the Order is delivered to the College, and the fact that
                  he has ceased to practise medicine will constitute a term, condition or
                  limitation on his certificate of registration.  

            (iii) If a Clinical Supervisor(s) who has given an undertaking in Appendix "B"
                  to the Order is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfil its terms, Dr.
                  Taniguchi shall obtain an executed undertaking in the same form from a
                  similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College and ensure
                  that it is delivered to the College. 

            (iv)  If Dr. Taniguchi is unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor in accordance
                  with paragraph (iii) of the Order, he shall cease practising medicine
                  immediately until such time as he has done so, and the fact that he has
                  done so will constitute a term, condition or limitation on his
                  certificate of registration until that time. 

            Notification of Practice Locations

            (v)   Dr. Taniguchi shall, within five (5) days of the date of the Order,
                  provide the College with the addresses of any locations where he
                  practises medicine, and, if he commences practice at a new location,
                  shall provide the College with its address within five (5) days. 

            Monitoring

            (vi)  Dr. Taniguchi shall consent to the disclosure by his Clinical
                  Supervisor(s) to each other and to the College and by the College to the
                  Clinical Supervisor(s) of all information the Clinical Supervisor(s) or
                  the College deem necessary or desirable in order to fulfil the Clinical
                  Supervisor(s)'s undertaking and to monitor Dr. Taniguchi's compliance
                  with the Order.

            (vii) Dr. Taniguchi shall within five (5) days of the Order provide the College
                  with his irrevocable consent to make inquiries of the Ontario Health
                  Insurance Plan (OHIP) by executing the OHIP consent form, attached at
                  Appendix "C", in order for the College to monitor his compliance with the
                  terms of the Order.

Concerns

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: July 15, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

Where the Quality Assurance Committee has made a decision on or after June 1, 2016 in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”), the College By-laws require that the elements of the SCERP be posted on the register. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the Quality Assurance Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)