Tanna, Gemini Vandravan (CPSO#: 72342)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 384
1929 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4G 3E8
Phone: 416-480-4976
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Tanna Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 08 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Tanna ( CPSO# 72342 )

Business Address:
384 - 1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4G 3E8
Phone Number: (416) 480-4976

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 May 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 15 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEMINI VANDRAVAN TANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANNA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2004