Tanner, Erika Lee (CPSO#: 81436)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 309
1580 Merivale Road
Ottawa ON  K2G 4B5
Phone: (613) 226-4030
Fax: (613) 225-3891
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Mar 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIKA LEE TANNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANNER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 13 Mar 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 14 Mar 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2007