Tansey, Patrick Alfred Harbison (CPSO#: 78758)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 170
4600 Highway 7
Toronto ON  L4L 4Y7
Phone: (416) 746-1818
Fax: (416) 746-1815
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Patrick Tansey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Tansey ( CPSO# 78758 )
Dr. H. Mackay ( CPSO# 78783 )

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Business Address:
4600 Highway 7
Suite 170
Woodbridge ON  L4L 4Y7
Phone Number: (416) 746-1818


Corporation Name: Dr. Helen J Mackay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Tansey ( CPSO# 78758 )
Dr. H. Mackay ( CPSO# 78783 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Odette Cancer Centre
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite T2-023
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5145

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 04 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICK ALFRED HARBISON TANSEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANSEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 02 Feb 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 03 Feb 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2009