Tapiawala, Shruti Niranjan (CPSO#: 83983)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Apr 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Apr 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Mumbai, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 14 Mar 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 15 Mar 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Apr 2009
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Mar 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Apr 2009