Taromi, Behzad (CPSO#: 81183)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:Islamic Azad University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203
1645 Dundas Street West
Mississauga ON  L5C 1E3
Phone: (905) 306-1449
Fax: (905) 306-1450
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Behzad Taromi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Taromi ( CPSO# 81183 )

Business Address:
Suite 203
1645 Dundas Street West
Mississauga ON  L5C 1E3
Phone Number: (905) 306-1449

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BEHZAD TAROMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAROMI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Aug 2004
Assessment Verification Period - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009