Tartaro, Piero (CPSO#: 79616)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite HG 64
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6799
Fax: (416) 480-5977
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Downsview Endoscopy Clinic
Suite 201
1635 Lawrence Ave West
Toronto ON  M6L 3C9
Canada
Phone: (416) 630-7388
Fax: (416) 630-7381
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

York Diagnostic Centre
3585 Keele Street, Unit 4
Toronto ON  M3J 3H5
Canada
Phone: (416) 398-2288
Fax: (416) 398-2588
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Piero Tartaro Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Tartaro ( CPSO# 79616 )

Business Address:
201- 1635 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6L 3C9
Phone Number: (416) 630-7388

Business Address:
4 - 3585 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M3J 3H5
Phone Number: (416) 398-2288

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room HG 64
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6799

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 07 Oct 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PIERO TARTARO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TARTARO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007