Tashkandi, Emad Mohammadamin A (CPSO#: 92596)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Umm Al Qura University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Oncology Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 2010 to 28 May 2010
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 May 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2016