Tashkandi, Muhammad Farhat K (CPSO#: 86054)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Dec 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Spanish

Education:King Saud University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
111 jaber street
riyadh 11457
Saudi Arabia
Phone: +966539088893

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saudi Arabia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jul 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MUHAMMAD FARHAT K TASHKANDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TASHKANDI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 09 Apr 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PEAP - Resident - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2012