Tassis, Andreas (CPSO#: 83635)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:Institute Medicine, Pharmacy,Timisoara, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 510
330 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P8
Phone: (905) 707-5007
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
Phone: (416) 530-6000 Ext. 3908
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B1B8
Canada
Phone: 905 848 7100
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Tassis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Tassis ( CPSO# 83635 )

Business Address:
1366 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M1T 3A7
Phone Number: (416) 926-0262

Business Address:
Suite 510
330 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P8
Phone Number: (905) 707-5007

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREAS TASSIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TASSIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2005 to 23 Oct 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 24 Oct 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2010