Tatham, Robert Brian (CPSO#: 32557)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
152 Tiny Beaches Rd S
Tiny ON  L0L2J0
Phone: 416 9967501
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian Tatham Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Tatham ( CPSO# 103665)
Dr. R. Tatham ( CPSO# 32557 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Salvation Army Toronto Grace Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 05 Sep 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT BRIAN TATHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TATHAM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985