Tavazzani, Franco Giorgio (CPSO#: 71615)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 May 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 May 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 48
2140 North Park Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9
Phone: (905) 790-9595
Fax: (905) 790-9590
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tavazzani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 26 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Tavazzani ( CPSO# 71615 )

Business Address:
Unit 48
2140 North Park Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9
Phone Number: (905) 790-9595

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANCO GIORGIO TAVAZZANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAVAZZANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 2003