Tawati, Sana Ahmed (CPSO#: 89228)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Sep 2010
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2010