Tay, Keng Yeow (CPSO#: 83297)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of New South Wales, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Campus
Department of Medical Imaging
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 52340
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Keng Yeow Tay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 30 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Tay ( CPSO# 83297 )

Business Address:
LHSC Victoria Campus
Department of Medical Imaging
800 Commissioners Road East
Suite C1-650
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 18 May 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENG YEOW TAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Aug 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2010