Tayag, Christel M (CPSO#: 84836)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Feb 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Feb 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tagalog

Education:Angeles University Foundatio, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 113
2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone: (519) 946-0246
Fax: (519) 258-2169
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christel Tayag Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 17 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Tayag ( CPSO# 84836 )

Business Address:
Unit 113
2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 946-0246

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTEL M TAYAG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAYAG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 23 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 06 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2009