Taylor, Hallie Ann (CPSO#: 94048)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Headwaters Health Care Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone: 5199412410
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Muneesh Jha Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 20 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Taylor ( CPSO# 94048 )
Dr. M. Jha ( CPSO# 92388 )

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6580

Business Address:
10 Lower Jarvis
Toronto ON  M5E 1Z2
Phone Number: (647) 827-9200


Corporation Name: Hallie Taylor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Taylor ( CPSO# 94048 )
Dr. M. Jha ( CPSO# 92388 )

Business Address:
Headwaters Health Care Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone Number: (519) 941-2410

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HALLIE ANN TAYLOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAYLOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011