Taylor, Ieleen Shubnam (CPSO#: 69392)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jul 1998