Taylor, John Alistair (CPSO#: 60986)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Oct 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Nov 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Walkers & New Medical Associates
495 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7N 2E3
Phone: (905) 634-9292
Fax: (905) 681-7274
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jul 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN ALISTAIR TAYLOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAYLOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 31 Oct 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Mar 1994
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 1996