Taylor, Katherine Louise (CPSO#: 81361)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Mar 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Mar 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Newcastle, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anaesthesia
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7445
Fax: (416) 813-7543
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Katherine Taylor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Taylor ( CPSO# 81361 )

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anesthesia
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-8921

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Mar 2006 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 09 Sep 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 10 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 May 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 16 May 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 16 May 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Katherine Louise Taylor may practise medicine independently in anaesthesia,
            only.