Taylor, Michael Jonathon (CPSO#: 73898)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
P O Box 1800
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7111
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cedarvale Terrace
429 Walmer Road
Toronto ON  M5P 2X9
Canada
Phone: (416) 967-6949
Fax: (416) 928-1965
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Castleview Wychwood Towers
351 Christie Street
Toronto ON  M6G 3C3
Canada
Phone: (416) 392-5700
Fax: (416) 928-1965
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Jonathon Taylor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Taylor ( CPSO# 73898 )

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Emergency Room
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7111

Business Address:
351 Christie Street
6th Floor
Toronto ON  M6G 3C3
Phone Number: (416) 392-5766

Business Address:
Cedarvale Terrace
429 Walmer Road
Toronto ON  M5P 2X9
Phone Number: (416) 967-6949

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JONATHON TAYLOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAYLOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2001