Taylor, Michel Andre (CPSO#: 96211)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 16 Aug 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - North Carolina

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 16 Aug 2018