Taylor, Pamela Lea (CPSO#: 88413)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Southampton, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Whitby Medical Arts Building
Suite 204
1615 Dundas Street East
Whitby ON  L1N 2L1
Phone: (289) 240-7962
Fax: (289) 240-7964
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Whitby Medical Arts Building
Unit 16
Whitby ON  L1N 2L1
Canada
Phone: 905-245-0477
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

70 Yorkville Avenue, #31
Toronto ON  M5R 1B9
Canada
Phone: (647) 343-0207
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Pamela Taylor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 19 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Taylor ( CPSO# 88413 )

Business Address:
Suite 204
1615 Dundas Street East
Whitby ON  L1N 2L1
Phone Number: (289) 240-7962

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAMELA LEA TAYLOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAYLOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
International Specialist Physician - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2009