Tbakhi, Abdelghani Issa A (CPSO#: 85950)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 14 Aug 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Jordan, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
KHCC
202 Queen Rania Al Abdulla St
Amman 11941
Jordan
Phone: 96265300460 Ext. 1082
Fax: 96265342567
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Tbakhi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Tbakhi ( CPSO# 85950 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Jordan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 14 Aug 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Mar 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Feb 2010
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Jun 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 03 Dec 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 23 Sep 2009 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Abdelghani Issa A. Tbakhi may practise medicine independently in Pathology,
            only.