Tchen, Nadine (CPSO#: 74417)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universite of Rene Descartes (Paris V), 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001