Teefy, Patrick John (CPSO#: 57062)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3075
Fax: (519) 663-3516
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

168 Essex Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 4S1
Canada
Phone: (519) 337-7535
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patrick Teefy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 02 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Teefy ( CPSO# 57062 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciiences Centre
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 663-3075

Business Address:
168 Essex Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 4R9
Phone Number: (519) 337-7535

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Room 6C - 121
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3075

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 24 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICK JOHN TEEFY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TEEFY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1988