Teichman, Joshua Cary (CPSO#: 88669)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Prism Eye Institute
Unit 1, 3200 Erin Mills Pkwy
Mississauga ON  L5L 1W8
Phone: (905) 456-3937
Fax: (905) 820-0111
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Prism Eye Institute
Unit 605, 7700 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L6Y 4M3
Canada
Phone: (905) 456-3937
Fax: (905) 456-5085
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

TLC Mississauga
50 Burnhamthorpe Rd W #101
Mississauga ON  L5B 3C2
Canada
Phone: 1 877-852-2020
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Prism Eye Institute
71 King Street West, Suite 207
Mississauga ON  L5B 4A2
Canada
Phone: 9054563937
Fax: 9058200111
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joshua C. Teichman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 08 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Teichman ( CPSO# 88669 )

Business Address:
1-3200 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga ON  L5L 1W8
Phone Number: (905) 456-3937

Business Address:
605-7700 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L6Y 4M3
Phone Number: (905) 456-3937

Business Address:
207-71 King Street West
Mississauga ON  L5B 4A2
Phone Number: (905) 456-3937

Business Address:
101-50 Burnhamthorpe Road West
Mississauga ON  L5B 3C2
Phone Number: (877) 852-2020

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSHUA CARY TEICHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TEICHMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013