Teixeira, Fernando Jose (CPSO#: 71526)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jan 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jan 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Emergency Medicine
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5095
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Fernando Teixeira Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 07 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Teixeira ( CPSO# 71526 )
Dr. C. Render-Teixeira ( CPSO# 76360 )

Business Address:
Department of Emergency Medicine
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5095

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Portugal

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FERNANDO JOSE TEIXEIRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TEIXEIRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2003