Teja, Bijan Jamil (CPSO#: 113492)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2018

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dartmouth Medical School, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Division of Critical Care Medicine
30 Bond St
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 360-4000
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BIJAN JAMIL TEJA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. TEJA is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. TEJA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. TEJA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. TEJA shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. TEJA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. TEJA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Aug 2017 to 28 Aug 2017
Elective Trainee - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 12 Sep 2017 to 25 Sep 2017
Elective Trainee - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Sep 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018