Tejani, Shezad (CPSO#: 94006)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 May 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 May 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Wayne State University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
East York Medical Centre
Suite 27E
45 Overlea Boulevard
Toronto ON  M4H 1C3
Phone: (416) 696-9836
Fax: 4166967881
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Pain Care Clinics
6981 Millcreek Drive - Unit 2
Mississauga ON  M1R 2X7
Canada
Phone: 2897247246
Fax: 2899142273
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Victoria Medical Group
Suite 205
1719 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1R 2X7
Canada
Phone: 4166091100
Fax: 4166091102
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Dec 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHEZAD TEJANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TEJANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 17 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 26 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 24 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 May 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 May 2016