Temple, Michelle Tara (CPSO#: 89922)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Temple Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 15 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Childrens Hospital of Eastern Ontario, 401 Smyth Road, Ottawa, ON, K1H 9L1
Date Received: 27 May 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Dec 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 06 Oct 2008 to 09 Nov 2008
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 10 Nov 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016