Templeton, Arnoud Jan (CPSO#: 97359)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jan 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Basel, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2012 to 05 Jun 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 06 Jun 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jan 2014
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2014