Tennant, Sarah Campbell (CPSO#: 95318)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Queen's University, 31 Jul 2012 to 06 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jun 2013