Teo, Astra Liling (CPSO#: 91487)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 600
1881 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 3C4
Phone: (416) 932-3172
Fax: (416) 440-0238
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scarborough Sexual Health Clinic
160 Borough Drive
Toronto ON  M1P 4N8
Canada
Phone: (416) 338-7438
Fax: (416) 338-6100
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Astra Teo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 3 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASTRA LILING TEO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TEO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011