Terrett, Luke Andrew (CPSO#: 94431)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Emergency Medicine
Royal University Hospital
103 Hospital Drive
Saskatoon SK  S7N 0W8
Phone: 306-655-1000 Ext. 16836

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUKE ANDREW TERRETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TERRETT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011