Terry, Warren Fredrick (CPSO#: 75376)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 31 Dec 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Sep 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jun 2008