Teshima, Christopher Wayne (CPSO#: 79477)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Dec 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
16-054 Cardinal Carter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: 416 864 5646
Fax: 416 864 5207
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C. Teshima Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 19 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Teshima ( CPSO# 79477 )

Business Address:
St. Michaels Hospital
16-054 Cardinal Carter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5646

Business Address:
Level 2
9080 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0Y7
Phone Number: (289) 597-7676

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 07 Oct 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER WAYNE TESHIMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TESHIMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 24 Mar 2008 to 11 Apr 2008
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2014