Teskey, Robert Joseph (CPSO#: 53829)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Nov 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Interventional Cardiology
Horizon Health Network
Saint John Regional Hospital Site
P O Box 2100, Stn Main
Saint John NB  E2L 4L2
Phone: (506) 648-6101
Fax: (506) 648-6110

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 28 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT JOSEPH TESKEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TESKEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 1985