Tessolini, Jenna Marie (CPSO#: 95668)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jan 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Joseph and Wolf Lebovic Complex
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Advance Endoscopy
Suite 206
688 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3B7
Canada
Phone: 416 463 7007
Fax: 416 463 7008
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 03 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNA MARIE TESSOLINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TESSOLINI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 01 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 02 Jun 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2017