Thain, Lisa Michele Fox (CPSO#: 59614)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 216
955 Major MacKenzie Drive
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Phone: (289) 553-5040
Fax: (289) 553-5042
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Partap Law Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Zia ( CPSO# 71413 )
Dr. B. Yeung ( CPSO# 77885 )
Dr. D. Boparai ( CPSO# 81452 )
Dr. L. Thain ( CPSO# 59614 )
Dr. P. Stroz ( CPSO# 59469 )
Dr. Y. Siow ( CPSO# 66696 )
Dr. E. Silmberg ( CPSO# 71544 )
Dr. M. Rooney ( CPSO# 51506 )
Dr. V. Partap ( CPSO# 74251 )
Dr. J. McKee ( CPSO# 33512 )
Dr. P. Law ( CPSO# 69001 )
Dr. N. Langhorne ( CPSO# 68045 )
Dr. F. Lan ( CPSO# 72316 )
Dr. N. Just ( CPSO# 70679 )
Dr. S. Isaacson ( CPSO# 55070 )
Dr. G. Hochman ( CPSO# 33401 )
Dr. R. Hany ( CPSO# 54238 )
Dr. R. Graham ( CPSO# 30863 )
Dr. P. Buckler ( CPSO# 79394 )
Dr. R. Cameron ( CPSO# 50334 )
Dr. R. Chan ( CPSO# 69076 )
Dr. F. Budhani ( CPSO# 86329 )
Dr. P. De Maio ( CPSO# 86122 )

Business Address:
Unit 3, 4, 5
125 Pedersen Drive
Aurora ON  L4G 0E3

Business Address:
B02 - 250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone Number: (905) 737-0595

Business Address:
104 - 679 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5G8
Phone Number: (905) 895-1313

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
Suite 102
955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Phone Number: (289) 553-6336

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA MICHELE FOX THAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THAIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1989