Thakrar, Dipen Ramniklal (CPSO#: 96026)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Sep 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
30 Bond St
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 340-4000
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 05 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIPEN RAMNIKLAL THAKRAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THAKRAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 07 Feb 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 08 Feb 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 15 Jan 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 16 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 15 Jul 2018
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Sep 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2018