Tham, Stephen Joseph (CPSO#: 62336)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Italian, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Via degli Aldobrandeschi 190 Rome 00613 Italy
Date Received: 16 May 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018