Thamilvaanan, Shanthi (CPSO#: 97508)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 May 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 May 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Jaffna, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1190 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8W 1B4
Phone: (519) 977-8899
Fax: (519) 977-8866
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Thamilvaanan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Thamilvaanan ( CPSO# 97508 )

Business Address:
1190 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8W 1B4
Phone Number: (519) 977-8899

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHANTHI THAMILVAANAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THAMILVAANAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 2012

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: July 19, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

NOTE: This decision has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: June 20, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
NOTE: This decision has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.

Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)