Thampi, Nisha (CPSO#: 84712)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Childrens Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
Division of Infectious Diseases
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nisha Thampi Medicine Professional Corporation/Nisha Thampi Medecine Societe Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Thampi ( CPSO# 84712 )

Business Address:
Childrens Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Division of Infectious Diseases
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 854-4366

Business Address:
College Square Medical Clinic
1980 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2C 0C6
Phone Number: (613) 854-6147

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 28 Feb 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NISHA THAMPI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THAMPI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 28 Feb 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Oct 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2013