Thangaroopan, Arulnmozhy (CPSO#: 72646)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Dalhousie University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 602
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone: (905) 953-7917
Fax: (905) 953-0046
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 895-4521
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thangaroopan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 05 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Thangaroopan ( CPSO# 72646 )

Business Address:
602 - 581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P4
Phone Number: (905) 953-7917


Corporation Name: A.Y. Reginald Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 27 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Reginald ( CPSO# 92246 )
Dr. A. Thangaroopan ( CPSO# 72646 )

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Ophthalmology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7015

Business Address:
228 - 1333 Shepard Avenue East
York ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 783-3375

Business Address:
Eagle Eye Clinic
376 Eagle Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 1K4
Phone Number: (905) 868-8725

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 30 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARULNMOZHY THANGAROOPAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THANGAROOPAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 10 Mar 2003 to 06 Apr 2003
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Apr 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2004