Thapar, Kamal (CPSO#: 58686)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 May 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Calgary, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Wisconsin Brain & Spine Center
1200 Oakleaf Way
Altoona WI  54701
United States
Phone: (715) 832-1700
Fax: (715) 832-4187

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Wisconsin

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 10 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAMAL THAPAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THAPAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1998 to 28 Feb 1999
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 1990