Thebault, Simon Daniel Xavier (CPSO#: 108877)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 23 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Cardiff University School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Hospital
Department of Neurology
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4000
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIMON DANIEL XAVIER THEBAULT shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. THEBAULT is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. THEBAULT shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. THEBAULT is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. THEBAULT shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. THEBAULT is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. THEBAULT no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 22 Sep 2016
Assessment Verification Period - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019