Therapondos, Georgios Panayiotis (CPSO#: 80115)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: George Therapondos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 28 2011

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2003 to 31 Oct 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 25 Jul 2004
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 26 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 07 Dec 2005
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Dec 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Dec 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011