Therrien, Joseph Alain Georges Jean (CPSO#: 53382)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1983

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1062 Ghislain
Suite 305
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3B2
Phone: (613) 632-2779
Fax: (613) 632-4011
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jean Therrien Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 12 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Therrien ( CPSO# 53382 )

Business Address:
305-1062 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3B2
Phone Number: (613) 632-2779

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH ALAIN GEORGES JEAN THERRIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THERRIEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1983

Concerns

Source: Other Canadian Colleges
Active Date: July 17, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Where a disciplinary finding is made against a member on or after September 1, 2015 by a medical regulatory or licensing authority in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding to be posted on the register, if the finding is known to the College.

The following are non-Ontario disciplinary findings made against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

On March 21, 2017, the Disciplinary Board of the Collège des médecins du Québec (CMQ) found Dr. Therrien guilty in respect of a complaint that he exceeded his field of competence, failed to consult to refer to a colleague or specialist, omitted an act or did an untimely act contrary to current scientific medical information, and did surgery without the necessary assistance, contrary to articles 42, 47 and 53 of the Code of Ethics of Physicians (Quebec), and article 59.2 of the Quebec Professional Code. The case involved treatment of a laceration of a young child’s eyelid. As the sanction for this finding, Dr. Therrien was struck from the CMQ’s register (i.e. suspended from practising medicine in Quebec) for a period of 6 weeks from April 24, 2017 to June 2, 2017. The College was notified of this finding by correspondence received on September 12, 2017.