Therrien, Judith (CPSO#: 73005)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 04 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McGill University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 26 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2001
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Aug 2004